Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio Gallego y Orbigo, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1729³BornOrbigo, Spain
14 Dec 177849.7AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
31 Oct 177950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 Dec 178859.7AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
17 May 179768.1DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Gallego y Orbigo
Archbishop Juan Antonio Gallego y Orbigo O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 95, Number 493
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016