Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basilio Tomás Sancho y Hernando (de Santas Justa y Rufina), Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note/Previous Titular See: (appointment to Granada after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1728Born
14 Apr 176637.5AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
17 Aug 176637.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
15 Dec 178759.2DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
17 Dec 178759.2AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Basilio Tomás Sancho y Hernando (de Santas Justa y Rufina)
Archbishop Basilio Tomás Sancho y Hernando (de Santas Justa y Rufina) Sch. P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva, Spain

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 84, Number 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 274
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast