Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Luna, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1729Born
19 Dec 176839.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
18 Nov 177041.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
16 Apr 177343.5DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Luna
Bishop Antonio de Luna O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarchena, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018