Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Joaquin Rubio de Arevalo

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1724³BornQuito
13 Nov 177551.1AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
24 Nov 177652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
Dec 1786³62.1DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Joaquin Rubio de Arevalo:
Bishop Mateo Joaquin Rubio de Arevalo (born , died Dec 1786) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,494
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015