Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Laplana y Castellón

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1719³BornBenabarre
26 Sep 176647.2AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
16 Nov 176647.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
8 May 177656.8DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Laplana y Castellón:
Bishop José Laplana y Castellón (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 84, Number 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015