Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Layon Bataclan

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cebu

Titular Bishop of Septimunicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1940 BornBantayan
1 May 196625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
24 Feb 199049.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
24 Feb 199049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunela
19 Apr 199049.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunela
3 May 199554.6AppointedBishop of Iligan, Philippines
21 Jun 200463.7ResignedBishop of Iligan, Philippines
21 Jun 200463.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Jun 200463.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
1 Oct 201575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emilio Layon Bataclan:
Bishop Emilio Layon Bataclan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cebu

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cebu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,965
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015