Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camilo Diaz Gregorio

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Batanes, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1939Born
1 Dec 196324.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Jose, Philippines
12 Jan 198747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
12 Jan 198747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus
29 Mar 198747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus
20 May 198949.6AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
27 Jul 198949.8InstalledBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
28 Aug 200060.9ResignedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
13 Sep 200363.9AppointedPrelate of Batanes, Philippines
20 May 201777.6RetiredPrelate of Batanes, Philippines
21 May 201878.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Batanes, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Camilo Diaz Gregorio
Bishop Camilo Diaz Gregorio (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Batanes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuyapo
Death PlaceSan Juan City

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2017
  • d: CB, 21 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 May 2018

Quantcast