Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Danilo Bangayan Ulep

Prelate of Batanes, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1962 Born
10 Apr 198724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tuguegarao, Philippines
20 May 201754.9AppointedPrelate of Batanes, Philippines
29 Jul 201755.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Batanes, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Danilo Bangayan Ulep
Bishop Danilo Bangayan Ulep (born ) Prelate of Batanes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuguegarao City, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Tuguegarao, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Batanes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jul 2017