Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gian Vincenzo Moreni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Turris in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1932BornMontichiari, Italy
4 Apr 195927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
29 Apr 198250.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turris in Mauretania
29 Apr 198250.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Tanzania
5 Jun 198250.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Turris in Mauretania
198451.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania
8 Sep 199058.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
3 Mar 199967.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gian Vincenzo Moreni:
Archbishop Gian Vincenzo Moreni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Philippines

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013