Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jose Serofia Palma

Archbishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1950 BornDingle
21 Aug 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
28 Nov 199747.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Nov 199747.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
13 Jan 199847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
13 Jan 199948.8AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
9 Mar 199948.9InstalledBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
18 Mar 200655.9AppointedArchbishop of Palo, Philippines
2 May 200656.1InstalledArchbishop of Palo, Philippines
15 Oct 201060.5AppointedArchbishop of Cebu, Philippines
13 Jan 201160.8InstalledArchbishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Serofia Palma:
Archbishop Jose Serofia Palma (born ) Archbishop of Cebu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cebu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2006
  • i: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,222
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015