Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Palo

Archidioecesis Palensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Forrosuelo Du, Archbishop
  • Pedro Rosales Dean, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 4,620 (1,784 Square Miles)
  • Description: Most of the province of Leyte
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 173, Cor. Pedrosa Ave. and San Jose St., Tacloban City, 6501 Leyte, Philippines
  • Telephone: (053)323-2213
  • Fax: 323-5607

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Palo
28 November 1937ErectedDiocese of Calbayog (Leyte) Diocese of Palo (erected)
23 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Palo Diocese of Maasin (erected)
Archdiocese of Palo
15 November 1982ElevatedDiocese of Palo Archdiocese of Palo
29 November 1988Territory LostArchdiocese of Palo Diocese of Naval (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Palo
1949970,8901,000,00097.1%67148111,986154153ap1951
1970875,135942,73892.8%77281058,334326546ap1971
1980973,2821,020,85795.3%79261059,269277852ap1981
Archdiocese of Palo
19901,690,8601,820,44092.9%1211713812,252196644ap1991
19991,120,5051,186,21194.5%12891378,17899449ap2000
20001,120,5051,186,21194.5%127101378,1781111849ap2001
20011,257,9771,572,47280.0%11991289,8271011949ap2002
20021,257,9771,572,47280.0%123101339,4581111950ap2003
20031,257,9771,572,47280.0%127151428,8581712550ap2004
20041,257,9771,572,47280.0%130141448,7351513052ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 1 Sep 2012