Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Sandalo Salvador

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Cebu

Titular Archbishop of Zarna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1925BornDalaguete
2 Mar 195328.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
3 Dec 196641.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
3 Dec 196641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
19 Jan 196742.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
21 Oct 196944.7AppointedBishop of Palo, Philippines
25 Sep 197247.7ResignedBishop of Palo, Philippines
25 Sep 197247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zarna
26 Jan 197348.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cebu, Philippines
26 Jan 197348.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zarna
14 Jul 199671.5DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manuel Sandalo Salvador:
Archbishop Manuel Sandalo Salvador (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Cebu

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 27 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015