Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Porfirio R. Iligan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Masbate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1922BornVinzons
2 Apr 194926.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 196845.8AppointedBishop of Masbate, Philippines
3 Sep 196846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Masbate, Philippines
14 Feb 199875.4RetiredBishop of Masbate, Philippines
6 Mar 200178.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Masbate, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Porfirio R. Iligan:
Bishop Porfirio R. Iligan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Masbate

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013