Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Bantigue y Natividad

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Pablo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1920BornHagonoy
31 May 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
29 May 196141.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
29 May 196141.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
25 Jul 196141.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
26 Jan 196747.0AppointedBishop of San Pablo, Philippines
18 Apr 196747.2InstalledBishop of San Pablo, Philippines
12 Jul 199575.4RetiredBishop of San Pablo, Philippines
20 Nov 201292.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Pablo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro Bantigue y Natividad:
Bishop Pedro Bantigue y Natividad (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Pablo

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013