Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Cruz Cortez

Prelate Emeritus of Infanta, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1949 Born
23 Jun 197424.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Pablo, Philippines
31 May 200454.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
31 May 200454.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
20 Aug 200455.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
27 Oct 201465.3AppointedPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
23 Jan 201565.5InstalledPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
16 May 202575.8RetiredPrelate of Infanta, Philippines

MicroData Summary
Bernardino Cruz Cortez
Bishop Bernardino Cruz Cortez
(born )
Prelate Emeritus of Infanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaclaran
Ordained BishopSaint Paul the First Hermit, Cathedral, San Pablo, Diocese of San Pablo

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Infanta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,674
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 27 Dec 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 16 May 2025