Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lipa

Archidioecesis Lipensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ramon Cabrera Argüelles, Archbishop
  • Salvador Q. Quizon, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 June 1972
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 3,165 (1,222 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the province of Batangas
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archlipa.org/
  • Mailing Address: St. Lorenzo Ruiz Rd., Lipa City, 4217 Batangas, Philippines
  • Telephone: (043)756.25.72
  • Fax: 75.60.005

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lipa
10 April 1910ErectedArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Lipa (erected)
2 July 1936Territory LostDiocese of Lipa Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro (erected)
28 March 1950Territory LostDiocese of Lipa Diocese of Lucena (erected)
25 April 1950Territory LostDiocese of Lipa Territorial Prelature of Infanta (erected)
28 November 1966Territory LostDiocese of Lipa Diocese of San Pablo (erected)
Archdiocese of Lipa
20 June 1972ElevatedDiocese of Lipa Archdiocese of Lipa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lipa
1950731,679816,52889.6%82241066,902146070ap1951
1969733,868756,26297.0%5635918,0644614041ap1971
Archdiocese of Lipa
19801,129,0001,163,00097.1%68269412,01011411744ap1981
19901,319,1451,409,14593.6%703410412,68414615446ap1991
19991,664,5631,786,83393.2%1052813312,51513518750ap2000
20001,760,9261,884,73593.4%1043714112,48814713751ap2001
20011,804,6401,905,34894.7%1053914412,53210419752ap2002
20021,850,1921,928,21396.0%1074014712,58616218952ap2003
20031,892,7461,972,56296.0%1183315112,53411815452ap2004
20041,843,6171,905,34896.8%1083914712,54114720053ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014