Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Quizon Quizon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lipa

Titular Bishop of Feradi Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1924BornManila
12 Mar 194924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lipa, Philippines
9 Jun 197954.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lipa, Philippines
9 Jun 197954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Minus
22 Aug 197954.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Minus
6 Apr 200277.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lipa, Philippines
5 Aug 201691.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lipa, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Salvador Quizon Quizon
Bishop Salvador Quizon Quizon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lipa

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 19 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 17 Aug 2015
  • d: CB, 6 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016