Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Torpigliani

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Malliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1915BornAsciano, Italy
24 Oct 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 196449.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Malliana
1 Sep 196449.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
1 Sep 196449.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
25 Oct 196449.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Malliana
3 Aug 196853.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
6 Jun 197358.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
Apr 199075.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
2 May 199580.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Philippines

MicroData Summary for Bruno Torpigliani:
Archbishop Bruno Torpigliani (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Philippines

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Aug 2014