Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave Olombe Atelumbu Musilamu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1927Born
28 Jul 195730.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 196841.3AppointedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Feb 196941.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Jun 199063.1ResignedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Feb 201183.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gustave Olombe Atelumbu Musilamu
Bishop Gustave Olombe Atelumbu Musilamu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYaounge

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ~d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018