Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume van den Elzen, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1913Born
29 Sep 194027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
13 Nov 195845.2AppointedPrefect of Doruma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Sep 196754.0AppointedBishop of Doruma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Jan 196854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Doruma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 May 198369.7ResignedBishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Jan 200086.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Guillaume van den Elzen
Bishop Guillaume van den Elzen O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Doruma-Dungu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUden

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017