Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile Aiti Waro Leru’a

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1936Born
21 Dec 196327.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 197841.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Apr 197942.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 May 198346.4SucceededBishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Sep 198952.7AppointedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Mar 199457.2ResignedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Aug 201679.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emile Aiti Waro Leru’a
Bishop Emile Aiti Waro Leru’a (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Isiro-Niangara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNderi

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2017, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017