Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Ricare Manguiran

Bishop Emeritus of Dipolog


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1936 BornCarcar
27 Dec 196630.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 198750.8AppointedBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
19 Aug 198751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
25 Jul 201477.9RetiredBishop of Dipolog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Ricare Manguiran:
Bishop Jose Ricare Manguiran (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dipolog

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dipolog.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,511
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014