Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaudencio Borbon Cardinal Rosales

Archbishop Emeritus of Manila

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1932 BornBatangas City
23 Mar 195825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lipa, Philippines
12 Aug 197442.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Aug 197442.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
28 Oct 197442.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
9 Jun 198249.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
14 Sep 198452.1SucceededBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
30 Dec 199260.4AppointedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
15 Sep 200371.1AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
21 Nov 200371.3InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
24 Mar 200673.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200673.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina
4 Mar 200774.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina
13 Oct 201179.2RetiredArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gaudencio Borbon Rosales:
Gaudencio Borbon Cardinal Rosales (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manila

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Manila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 14 Oct 2014