Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Socrates Calamba Mesiona, M.S.P.

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Princesa, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Budua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1963 Born
14 Apr 198925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mission Society of the Philippines
2004²40.2AppointedSuperior General of Mission Society of the Philippines
Jan 2009³45.2ResignedSuperior General of Mission Society of the Philippines
28 Oct 201653.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Princesa, Philippines
28 Oct 201653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
10 Feb 201753.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Socrates Calamba Mesiona
Bishop Socrates Calamba Mesiona M.S.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Princesa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagbilaran, Bohol
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception Cathedral, Puerto Princesa, Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 14 Nov 2016
  • c2+/mn: CB, 8 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017