Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa

Vicariatus Apostolicus Portus Principis in Philippins



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pedro D. Arigo, Vicar Apostolic

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 13 May 2002
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 8,552 (3,303 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Office, 14 Taft Str., Puerto Princess City, 5300 Palawan, Philippines
  • Telephone: (048)433.2568
  • Fax: 434.3896

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Palawan
10 April 1910ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Palawan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Palawan
3 July 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Palawan Vicariate Apostolic of Palawan
13 May 2002Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Palawan Vicariate Apostolic of Taytay (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa
13 May 2002Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Palawan Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Palawan
195082,568110,60074.7%713204,12812ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Palawan
1970183,680233,67878.6%1617335,5661746ap1971
1980258,638340,79575.9%3911505,172114927ap1981
1990386,296528,86673.0%393429,19734330ap1991
1999490,605685,30471.6%491509,81214837ap2000
2001503,855709,28971.0%601618,25915537ap2002
Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa
2002376,726443,20885.0%2632912,99033821ap2003
2003373,142466,42780.0%2262813,32684224ap2004
2004379,377472,67880.3%346409,48485025ap2005
2010419,768612,01468.6%29103910,763133935ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014