Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgardo Sarabia Juanich

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Taytay, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Ausuaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1952 Born
11 Jul 197624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palawan, Philippines
13 May 200250.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taytay, Philippines
13 May 200250.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuaga
11 Jul 200250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuaga
14 Nov 201866.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Taytay, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Edgardo Sarabia Juanich
Bishop Edgardo Sarabia Juanich (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Taytay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaytay
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puerto Princesa, Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Taytay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,223
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast