Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Franco

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Israel

Titular Archbishop of Gallesium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1937 BornPuglianello, Italy
10 Jul 196023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
28 Mar 199255.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gallesium
28 Mar 199255.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ukraine
26 Apr 199255.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gallesium
14 Aug 199356.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zakarpattia, Ukraine
7 Oct 199760.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Zakarpattia, Ukraine
6 Apr 199962.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
21 Jan 200668.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Israel
21 Jan 200668.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
21 Jan 200668.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
18 Aug 2012³75.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Israel
18 Aug 2012³75.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
18 Aug 2012³75.4RetiredApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Franco:
Archbishop Antonio Franco (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Israel

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Israel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,670
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2012
  • ab: CB, 13 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 27 Oct 2014