Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Celeste Trance

Bishop of Catarman


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1953 BornCalinog Iloilo
17 May 197824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
14 May 200450.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Catarman, Philippines
22 Jul 200450.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Catarman, Philippines
10 Mar 200551.6SucceededBishop of Catarman, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Celeste Trance:
Bishop Emmanuel Celeste Trance (born ) Bishop of Catarman

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catarman.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,658

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013