Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Robles Capalla

Archbishop Emeritus of Davao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1934 BornLeon
18 Mar 196126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
2 Apr 197540.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
2 Apr 197540.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Grumentum
18 Jun 197540.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Grumentum
25 Apr 197742.4AppointedPrelate of Iligan, Philippines
18 Feb 197843.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Grumentum
15 Nov 198248.0AppointedBishop of Iligan, Philippines
28 Jun 199459.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Davao, Philippines
6 Nov 199662.0SucceededArchbishop of Davao, Philippines
11 Feb 201277.2RetiredArchbishop of Davao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Fernando Robles Capalla:
Archbishop Fernando Robles Capalla (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Davao

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Davao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • mn: CB, 14 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 1 Aug 2015