Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nicolasora Nilmar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1916BornMiagao
29 Jun 194225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
20 Feb 195942.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaro, Philippines
20 Feb 195942.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zapara
11 May 195942.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zapara
3 Jan 196750.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Davao, Philippines
18 Apr 197053.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
3 Jun 197659.7AppointedBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
21 Nov 199276.2RetiredBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
18 Oct 200791.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalibo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan Nicolasora Nilmar:
Bishop Juan Nicolasora Nilmar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalibo

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 41
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 14 Jul 2015