Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julio Cardinal Rosales y Ras

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cebu

Cardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Gesù agonizzante a Vitinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1906BornCalbayog
2 Jun 192922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Calbayog, Philippines
22 Jun 194639.8AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
21 Sep 194640.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
17 Dec 194943.2AppointedArchbishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Apr 196962.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196962.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Gesù agonizzante a Vitinia
24 Aug 198275.9RetiredArchbishop of Cebu, Philippines
2 Jun 198376.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Julio Rosales y Ras:
Julio Cardinal Rosales y Ras (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cebu

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 19 Oct 2014