Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin de la Peña y Angot, M.S.P.

Prelate of Marawi, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1954 Born
22 Apr 198127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mission Society of the Philippines
23 Jun 200046.2AppointedPrelate of Marawi, Philippines
22 Oct 200147.5AppointedPrelate of Marawi, Philippines
27 Dec 200147.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Marawi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Edwin de la Peña y Angot
Bishop Edwin de la Peña y Angot M.S.P. (born ) Prelate of Marawi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan (Siquijor)

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Marawi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast