Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ozamis

Archidioecesis Ozamisanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jesus Armamento Dosado, C.M., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 January 1983
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 1,939 (748 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the province of Misamis Occidental
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 2760, Rizal Avenue, Banadero, 7200 Ozamiz City, Philipines
  • Telephone: (088)521.2820
  • Fax: 521.1574

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Ozamis
27 January 1951ErectedDiocese of Cagayan de Oro (Provinces of Lanao and Misamis Occiental) Territorial Prelature of Ozamis (erected)
Diocese of Ozamis
17 February 1971ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Ozamis Diocese of Ozamis
Archdiocese of Ozamis
24 January 1983ElevatedDiocese of Ozamis Archdiocese of Ozamis

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Ozamis
1969386,173896,30143.1%745527,4264510234ap1971
Diocese of Ozamis
1980251,340346,85472.5%1519347,392195816ap1981
Archdiocese of Ozamis
1990336,546461,02373.0%2612388,856124119ap1991
1999366,498488,66575.0%2512379,905145618ap2000
2000322,586454,35071.0%2314378,718177218ap2001
2001332,263467,98071.0%2314378,980177218ap2002
2002345,573486,72371.0%2313369,599139018ap2003
2003369,789506,56173.0%2914438,599177516ap2004
2004397,078539,34273.6%28113910,181149516ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011