Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Henry Cronin, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1913Born
21 Dec 193724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
24 May 195541.4AppointedPrelate of Ozamis, Philippines
24 May 195541.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaza
25 Sep 195541.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaza
13 Oct 197056.8AppointedArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
5 Jan 198874.0RetiredArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
19 Feb 199177.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Patrick Henry Cronin (VIAF: 97752132)
Archbishop Patrick Henry Cronin S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoneygall, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Columban’s College, Dalgan Park, Galway, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 86
  • mn: CB, 11 Aug 2015
  • c1: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast