Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Rodgers

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1903BornKillanena
19 Jun 192724.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 194844.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
10 Jan 194844.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebela
7 Mar 194844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebela
25 Oct 195552.5SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
10 Jul 196663.2DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rodgers:
Bishop Joseph Rodgers (born , died ) Bishop of Killaloe

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 9 Feb 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015