Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop MIchael Joseph Moloney, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1912Born
20 Jun 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
195138.6AppointedPrefect of Bathurst in Gambia
24 Dec 195745.6AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Gambia
4 May 195845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Gambia
14 Nov 198068.5ResignedBishop of Banjul, Gambia
31 Dec 199179.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia

MicroData Summary for MIchael Joseph Moloney
Bishop MIchael Joseph Moloney C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banjul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaloe, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Sep 2020

Quantcast