Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Sagna, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Louis du Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1932BornZiguinchor
4 Oct 195927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Dec 197442.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
11 May 197542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
22 Feb 200370.6ResignedBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
24 May 200875.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

MicroData Summary for Pierre Sagna:
Bishop Pierre Sagna C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013