Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Jean-Marie Dossavi

Deceased

Bishop of Aného, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1934Born
30 Jun 196329.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 199661.6AppointedBishop of Aného, Togo
28 Apr 199661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aného, Togo
13 Sep 200571.2DiedBishop of Aného, Togo

MicroData Summary for Paul Jean-Marie Dossavi
Bishop Paul Jean-Marie Dossavi (born , died ) Bishop of Aného

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBokpa

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,744
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018