Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Banjul

Dioecesis Baniulensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Patrick Ellison, C.S.Sp., Bishop
  • Michael J. Cleary, C.S.Sp., Bishop Emeritus
  • Matteo Farrelly, C.S.Sp., Superior Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 May 1974
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Gambia
  • Square Kilometers: 10,403 (4,018 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.banjuldiocese.gm/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 165, Banjul, The Gambia
  • Telephone: 4390.767
  • Fax: 4377.607

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Gambia
6 May 1931ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia Mission "Sui Iuris" of Gambia (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Bathurst in Gambia
8 March 1951ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Gambia Prefecture Apostolic of Bathurst in Gambia
Diocese of Bathurst in Gambia
24 June 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bathurst in Gambia Diocese of Bathurst in Gambia
Diocese of Banjul
9 May 1974Name ChangedDiocese of Bathurst in Gambia Diocese of Banjul

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Gambia
19503,125226,0301.4%66520101ap1951
Prefecture Apostolic of Bathurst in Gambia
Diocese of Bathurst in Gambia
19594,721278,9001.7%11415314136ap1960
19708,061316,0002.6%1717474191610ap1971
Diocese of Banjul
198012,630580,0002.2%171774217203ap1981
199016,100812,0002.0%41620805224313ap1991
199933,0001,550,0002.1%1113241,375244853ap2000
200036,5001,720,0002.1%1212241,520235153ap2001
200130,0001,500,0002.0%1212241,250234556ap2002
200233,0001,575,0002.1%1312251,320234556ap2003
200334,4001,639,5002.1%1511261,323224256ap2004
200435,5001,680,5002.1%1510251,420214254ap2005
200642,4001,787,0002.4%1311241,766214256ap2007
201244,0001,932,0002.3%1812301,466135319ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013