Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gabriel Mendy, C.S.Sp.

Bishop-Elect of Banjul, Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1967 Born
31 Aug 199629.3Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Nov 199730.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Nov 201750.6AppointedBishop of Banjul, Gambia
3 Feb 201850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Banjul, Gambia

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Mendy
Father Gabriel Mendy C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Banjul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamin, Diocese of Banjul
Ordained BishopIndependence Stadium, Bakau

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Banjul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Dec 2017