Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Freetown

Archidioecesis Liberae Urbis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Edward Tamba Charles, Archbishop
  • Joseph Henry Ganda, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 15 January 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sierra Leone
  • Square Kilometers: 4,677 (1,806 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Santanno House, P.O. Box 98, 10 Howe St., Freetown, Sierra Leone
  • Telephone: (076)771.165

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone
13 April 1858ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone (erected)
18 October 1897Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Francese (erected)
18 April 1903Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone Prefecture Apostolic of Liberia (erected)
Diocese of Freetown and Bo
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone Diocese of Freetown and Bo
3 April 1952Territory LostDiocese of Freetown and Bo Prefecture Apostolic of Makeni (erected)
11 November 1970ElevatedDiocese of Freetown and Bo Diocese of Freetown and Bo
11 November 1970Territory LostDiocese of Freetown and Bo Diocese of Kenema (erected)
Archdiocese of Freetown and Bo
15 January 2011SplitArchdiocese of Freetown and Bo Diocese of Bo
Archdiocese of Freetown
Archdiocese of Freetown
15 January 2011SplitArchdiocese of Freetown and Bo Diocese of Bo
Archdiocese of Freetown

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Freetown and Bo
195011,0792,250,000.5%383829140284ap1951
197037,0961,282,7892.9%14950741524420ap1971
Archdiocese of Freetown and Bo
198040,426974,0004.2%530351,155324014ap1981
199041,1021,068,0003.8%1817351,174195719ap1991
199788,6001,655,6005.4%2919481,845465621ap2000
200091,5001,800,0005.1%3022521,759325622ap2001
200124,2211,823,0001.3%30194949431722ap2002
200297,2342,300,8754.2%3718551,76734822ap2003
2003101,6782,800,9933.6%4018581,753392122ap2004
2004127,8512,918,0004.4%4116572,243332527ap2005
2006141,2003,214,7004.4%3913522,715332926ap2007
Archdiocese of Freetown
201120,0001,776,8711.1%251540500312313bul:15jan2011
201270,0001,500,0004.7%2511361,944351415ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 11 Aug 2013