Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Allieu Matthew Campbell

Bishop of Bo, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1961 Born
9 Apr 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
15 Jan 201149.9AppointedBishop of Bo, Sierra Leone
7 May 201150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bo, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Charles Allieu Matthew Campbell
Bishop Charles Allieu Matthew Campbell (born ) Bishop of Bo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNjala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,051

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018