Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Tamba Charles

Archbishop of Freetown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1956 BornKainkordu
4 Apr 198630.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kenema, Sierra Leone
15 Mar 200851.9AppointedArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
14 May 200852.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Edward Tamba Charles:
Archbishop Edward Tamba Charles (born ) Archbishop of Freetown

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Freetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013