Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Daniel Koroma

Deceased

Bishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1950Born
18 Dec 197727.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 200251.9AppointedBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
29 Jun 200252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
14 Dec 201868.6DiedBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Patrick Daniel Koroma
Bishop Patrick Daniel Koroma (born , died ) Bishop of Kenema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJenneh
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kenema, Diocese of Kenema
Death PlaceFreetown, Archdiocese of Freetown

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,217
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jul 2019

Quantcast