Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Aruna

Bishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1964 Born
16 Apr 199328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kenema, Sierra Leone
7 Jan 201247.4AppointedBishop of Makeni, Sierra Leone
5 Jan 201348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Makeni, Sierra Leone
18 Jul 201550.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
18 Jul 201550.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
26 Jan 201954.4AppointedBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Henry Aruna
Bishop Henry Aruna (born ) Bishop of Kenema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYemandu
Ordained BishopSaint Edward Secondary School, Freetown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kenema.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Dec 2012
  • c34: CB, 10 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,621
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 2
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Jan 2019

Quantcast