Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Polycarp Cardinal Pengo

Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora de La Salette


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1944 BornMwazye
20 Jun 197126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
11 Nov 198339.2AppointedBishop of Nachingwea, Tanzania
6 Jan 198439.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nachingwea, Tanzania
17 Oct 198642.1AppointedBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
22 Jan 199045.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
22 Jul 199247.9SucceededArchbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
21 Feb 199853.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199853.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora de La Salette
26 Apr 199853.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora de La Salette

MicroData Summary for Polycarp Pengo:
Polycarp Cardinal Pengo (born ) Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Apr 1998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015