Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Beatus Kinyaiya, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Dodoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1957 BornShimbwe
5 Jun 198831.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Jun 198932.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Apr 200648.9AppointedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
2 Jul 200649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
6 Nov 201457.4AppointedArchbishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
18 Jan 201557.6InstalledArchbishop of Dodoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Beatus Kinyaiya:
Archbishop Beatus Kinyaiya O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Dodoma

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dodoma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,203
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 19 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015