Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jude Thadaeus Ruwa’ichi, O.F.M. Cap.

Coadjutor Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1954 Born
25 Nov 198127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Feb 199945.0AppointedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
16 May 199945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
15 Jan 200550.9AppointedBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
19 Feb 200551.0InstalledBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
10 Nov 201056.7AppointedArchbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
9 Jan 201156.9InstalledArchbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
21 Jun 201864.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Jude Thadaeus Ruwa’ichi
Archbishop Jude Thadaeus Ruwa’ichi O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Dar-es-Salaam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMulo-Kilema

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,555
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast