Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mbulu

Dioecesis Mbuluensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Arusha
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 16,057 (6,202 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 49, Mbulu, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (027)253.3055; 253.3113
  • Fax: 253.3114

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mbulu
14 April 1943ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Dodoma
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Mbulu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mbulu
10 January 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mbulu Vicariate Apostolic of Mbulu
Diocese of Mbulu
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mbulu Diocese of Mbulu
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Dodoma
Diocese of Mbeya
Diocese of Mbulu
Archdiocese of Tabora
Diocese of Singida (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Mbulu
194910,000500,0002.0%612185551559ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Mbulu
Diocese of Mbulu
196953,9501219311,740222317ap1971
198064,440437,80014.7%1515302,148176522ap1981
1990134,594630,00021.4%2118393,451236827ap1991
1999225,809842,00026.8%3919583,893245933ap2000
2000241,271701,40634.4%4626723,350337134ap2001
2001209,666701,40629.9%4233752,795419735ap2002
2002217,279701,40631.0%4232742,936499736ap2003
2003226,559924,46224.5%4435792,8674711436ap2004
2004242,698924,46226.3%4633793,0725417536ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014