Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Winters, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbulu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1908BornRamore, Ireland
5 Jul 193829.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
29 Jan 194435.3AppointedPrefect of Mbulu, Tanzania
10 Jan 195243.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mbulu, Tanzania
10 Jan 195243.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
4 May 195243.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Burca
25 Mar 195344.5AppointedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
3 Jul 197162.7ResignedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
1 Apr 199485.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbulu, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Patrick Winters:
Bishop Patrick Winters S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbulu

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013